THE CITY OF LONDON CORPORATION COMBINED RELIEF OF POVERTY CHARITY

Charity number: 1073660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 29 January 1999: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2011: Funds received from 206932 SIR JOHN PHILPOT'S CHARITY
  • 09 June 2011: Funds received from 206934 MARY WILKES'S CHARITY
  • 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 30 October 2012: Re-registered
  • 08 April 2019: Funds received from 206643 CORPORATION OF LONDON BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
  • 18 May 2020: Funds received from 206949 SIGNOR FAVALE'S MARRIAGE PORTION CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE JENNER BEQUEST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property