Governing document BRIXHAM HERITAGE MUSEUM & HISTORY SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH MARCH 1963 AND LAWS AS AMENDED 22ND OCTOBER 1964, 7TH MARCH 1973, 30TH MARCH 1977, 30TH JANUARY 1980, 24TH NOVEMBER 1994, 21 NOVEMBER 1996, 22 MAY 1997, 27 NOVEMBER 1997, 15TH JANUARY 1999 AND 30TH NOVEMBER 2000. AS AMENDED ON 15/06/2015
Charitable objects
A MUSEUM, LIBRARY AND READING ROOM TO PROMOTE THE SYSTEMATIC STUDY OF THE HISTORY OF BRIXHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS AND THE PEOPLE FLORA AND FAUNA THEREIN AND THE INTERCHANGE AND DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE THEREOF.
Area of benefit
BRIXHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.