Financial history ALLHALLOWS MUSEUM SOCIETY OF HONITON

Charity number: 306645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £25.39k £26.11k £25.01k £16.93k £35.59k
Total expenditure £24.93k £21.82k £26.01k £14.61k £12.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £17.43k