TAVISTOCK SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND (KNOWN AS TAVISTOCK COLLEGE ENDOWMENT FUND)

Charity number: 306658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.85k £18.13k £13.37k £13.66k £13.94k
Total expenditure £17.77k £13.14k £17.78k £17.78k £13.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A