Financial history THE SIR ANDREW JUDD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £2.43m £2.15m £2.00m £1.88m £2.15m
Total expenditure £2.83m £2.74m £2.02m £2.63m £1.98m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.58m £1.29m £1.20m £1.88m £2.15m
Income - Other £854.00k £854.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.57m £2.47m £1.87m £2.46m £1.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £259.68k £273.66k £144.23k £166.15k £71.54k
Expenditure - Governance £8.90k £9.08k £16.46k £16.71k £46.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.56m £2.46m £1.86m £2.28m £1.66m
Expenditure - Investment management £259.68k £248.16k £114.23k £136.15k £41.54k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0