Trustees SOUTHAMPTON ENGINEERING TRAINING ASSOCIATION LTD
Charity number: 307299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Millard | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
April Lancashire | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Freemantle | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN SAVAGE | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
GLYN EDWARD MASON | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.