THE PBC TRUST

Charity number: 1123723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/12/2015 30/12/2016 30/12/2017 30/12/2018 30/12/2019
Total gross income £4.58k £4.65k £4.65k £8.55k £9.63k
Total expenditure £12.83k £12.62k £12.50k £12.92k £12.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A