Accounts and annual returns FLITCHAM VILLAGE HALL AND COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1061261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 October 2021 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 November 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required