Trustees ST CLARE WEST ESSEX HOSPICE CARE TRUST
Charity number: 1063631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nik Johnathan Hasler Wright | Chair | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Muntazir Haji | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Howe | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Wright | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Charles Slade | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GORDON BALFOUR | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Jeffrey Alan James Phillips | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Monica Bose | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Edward Astarita | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL ROWLINSON | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Philip Thomas Birch | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.