Trustees SHERBORNE SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
Charity number: 307427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUISE DRUMMOND HALL | Chair | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
James Martin Scott | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Mary Saker | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Craig-McFeely | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JANE EDWARDS | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Amanda Hughes | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Christopher Taylor | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Susan Massey | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Allan Paul Williams | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Sara Blanch | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rt. Rev. Karen Marisa Gorham | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS JOHN STIRLING WORDIE | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr Steven George Connors | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARIA WINGFIELD DIGBY | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
AMANDA LOUISE HARRIS | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
ROBIN ANTHONY LANGLEY LEACH | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.