CARERS SUPPORT SPELTHORNE

Charity number: 1061488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 February 2020 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 February 2020 393 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 August 2016 On time Download