CARERS SUPPORT SPELTHORNE

Charity number: 1061488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £129.23k £114.74k £19 £600 £69
Total expenditure £105.91k £126.68k £736 £500 £20.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £124.45k £108.11k N/A N/A N/A