WEST NORFOLK DEAF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1064118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £121.46k £156.73k £191.16k £187.42k £231.17k
Total expenditure £116.12k £159.42k £198.37k £205.70k £226.87k
Income from government contracts £79.72k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £80.18k £62.33k £58.00k £54.65k