ST NICHOLAS (C OF E) SCHOOL, CHISLEHURST - SCHOOL GOVERNORS FUND

Charity number: 307642
Charity reporting is overdue by 814 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 448 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 448 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 814 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 July 2018 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required