ST NICHOLAS (C OF E) SCHOOL, CHISLEHURST - SCHOOL GOVERNORS FUND

Charity number: 307642
Charity reporting is overdue by 815 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £2 £2 £0 £0 £70.56k
Total expenditure £1.54k £30 £0 £0 £51.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A