ST NICHOLAS (C OF E) SCHOOL, CHISLEHURST - SCHOOL GOVERNORS FUND

Charity number: 307642
Charity reporting is overdue by 811 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dustin Carere Trustee 11 November 2014 None on record
MRS. ANNE SCOBIE Trustee None on record
MICHELLE FRIBBENS Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
James Griffiths Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Rev ALAN MUSTOE Trustee 24 January 2012 None on record
Katrina Pauling Chair 09 December 2013 None on record
Sophie Sear Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
LYNSEY MARIE BARNES Trustee None on record
David Anthony Sharpe Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record