THE CEDARS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 August 2019 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required