THE CEDARS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £16.44k £14.07k £27.79k £7.31k £3.36k
Total expenditure £14.06k £13.29k £25.41k £9.56k £48.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A