Trustees MERCHANT TAYLORS SCHOOL
Charity number: 1063740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUNCAN GUY MACDONALD EGGAR | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Williams | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bond | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Barefoot | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Christian Oram | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Varun Paul | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Honourable Richard Hugh Eaton Newall | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew martin Cree | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Emily Orr | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Douglas Robert Twining | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
GUY BEETHAM MAURICE HENRY DU PARC BRAHAM | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE REDMAN | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alan Eastwood | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Angharad Morgan | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MARK COX | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEEPAKKUMAR VELJI VAJABHAI HARIA | Trustee | 02 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN BROOMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.