Trustees CALDECOTT FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 307889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES LISTER OBE Chair 27 April 2017
None on record
Folasade Phillips Trustee 20 October 2022
The African People's Historical Monument Foundation (Black Cultural Archives) Limited
Received: On time
CAROLINE WHILLANS Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Maree Thorn Trustee 14 May 2020
None on record
Simon Richard Wakeman Trustee 22 November 2018
None on record
Susan Appleby Trustee 27 September 2018
None on record
JEROME FLECHAIS Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
COLIN GREEN Trustee 27 November 2014
None on record
JOHN FLETCHER Trustee 31 July 2014
THE COBTREE CHARITY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time