Financial history LEARNING SPACE

Charity number: 1061545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £269.45k £324.91k £361.03k £349.38k £905.44k
Total expenditure £227.57k £274.55k £329.33k £370.77k £836.77k
Income from government contracts N/A £133.75k £118.39k £253.15k £215.54k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.33k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £291
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £899.81k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £14
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.33k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £836.77k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0