SIMON LANGTON SCHOOLS

Charity number: 307941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Stalley Trustee 30 November 2019 None on record
Georgina Anne GLOVER Trustee
STURRY AND DISTRICT UNITED CHURCH Overdue by 84 days
NECESSARY FURNITURE Received: On time
Ash Reygate Trustee 07 July 2021 None on record
PAUL FREDERICK ADDIS OBE Trustee
1248 Langton Association Overdue by 357 days
Douglas Agnew Trustee 07 July 2021 None on record
Philip Sandey Trustee 24 November 2016 None on record
Gilda Scarfe Trustee 27 March 2017 None on record
Nigel Wootton Trustee 14 January 2014 None on record
Simon Cook Trustee 28 November 2019 None on record
ashley kimble Trustee 30 November 2017 None on record