Financial history MALLING DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 308139
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £128.30k £163.98k £136.19k £148.89k £170.62k
Total expenditure £112.11k £170.34k £168.11k £78.66k £81.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £12.80k £15.76k