LIVERPOOL PRIMARY CARE TRUST CHARITY

Charity number: 1061581
Charity reporting is overdue by 1036 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £5.66k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £20.07k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0