WOODLAND VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity number: 1063591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.67k £3.23k £4.00k £3.20k £3.67k
Total expenditure £3.83k £2.76k £4.76k £3.00k £4.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A