Financial history ALL SAINTS MILLENNIUM TRUST (DARLINGTON) LIMITED

Charity number: 1061725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £23.48k £26.62k £22.39k £12.92k £12.58k
Total expenditure £22.97k £22.76k £22.59k £25.06k £26.03k
Income from government contracts £500 N/A £750 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A