Accounts and annual returns LADY FRANCES WINCHCOMBE'S THATCHAM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 14 August 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 October 2019 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window