SHINFIELD ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TRUST (PIGGATT AND FEILDE FOUNDATION)

Charity number: 309050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 March 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 18 March 2021 383 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required