Trustees THE WELLINGTON COLLEGE

Charity number: 309093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Jackson MA Chair 01 March 2017
None on record
Emma Margaret Judge Trustee 18 March 2022
FAMILY LINKS (EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES)
Received: On time
Sir Christopher Linley Tickell Trustee 14 October 2021
ROYAL ENGINEERS CENTRAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Christie May Marr Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
James Richard Garvey Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Emma Elizabeth Ann McKendrick Trustee 26 June 2020
SANDROYD SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
SARUM HALL SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
PREP SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
THE EMMOTT FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
ELSTREE SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Mark Gordon Milliken-Smith QC Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Jill Miranda May BA Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Helen Claire Stevenson MSc Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
FELICITY ANN KIRK LLB Trustee 01 December 2015
None on record
VIRGINIA ELIZABETH RHODES BA Trustee 01 December 2015
None on record
The Duke of Wellington Arthur Wellelsley KG, LVO, OBE, MC, DL Trustee 17 June 2014
None on record
DUNCAN STUART RITCHIE FCA Trustee 18 December 2013
None on record
RONALD DENNIS CBE Trustee 20 March 2011
PODIUM ANALYTICS
Received: On time
DREAMCHASING
Received: On time
LORD THOMAS Galloway Dunlop du Roy de Blicquy Galbraith STRATHCLYDE CH, PC, BA Trustee 20 March 2011
None on record