Trustees ST PETER'S COLLEGE, RADLEY

Charity number: 309243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Craig Shaw Smellie Chair
None on record
Charles Howard Palmer Trustee 01 August 2021
None on record
Carole Sweetnam Trustee 01 August 2021
None on record
WILLIAM MAYDON Trustee 01 August 2020
THE RADLEY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARY BREEN Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Henry Morris Trustee 06 December 2019
None on record
Rev STEPHEN W P HAMPTON Trustee 03 March 2017
None on record
SIMON J B SHAW Trustee 13 June 2015
None on record
HUGH J R WILLIS MA Trustee 14 June 2014
None on record
JANE MARTINEAU Trustee 30 November 2012
None on record
RICHARD HUNTINGFORD Trustee 21 March 2012
THE RADLEY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SIR JOHN HOLMES GCVOKBECMG Trustee 21 March 2012
None on record
MRS E MCKENDRICK BA Trustee
THE PRE-SENIOR BACCALAUREATE TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL MERCHANT NAVY EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ROYAL MERCHANT NAVY SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Mark Rushton Trustee
THE UNIVERSITY OF BUCKINGHAM
Overdue by 391 days
THOMAS OLIVER SEYMOUR MA Trustee
THE RADLEY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DEBORAH PLUCK Trustee
Wychwood School Charity Limited
Received: On time
Tom Durie Trustee
DULWICH PREP CRANBROOK
Received: On time
JOHN BRIDCUT MA Trustee
None on record
GERALD KAYE BSC FRICS Trustee
None on record
ROBERT WARNER ACA Trustee
None on record
NIGEL HENDERSON MA FRCS Trustee
None on record