BEAR CLUB FOUNDATION (CHARITY OF JAMES MAYNARD)

Charity number: 309457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £706 £889 £534 £734 £547
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £520 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A