Financial history MARLBOROUGH COLLEGE

Charity number: 309486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £53.19m £59.79m £59.98m £56.42m £52.05m
Total expenditure £28.52m £61.02m £54.79m £57.93m £50.89m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.41m £677.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £357.00k £3.54m £1.13m £3.49m £1.58m
Income - Other trading activities £1.22m £1.66m £1.43m £945.00k £1.06m
Income - Charitable activities £48.61m £52.63m £55.14m £49.83m £47.91m
Income - Endowments £101.00k £1.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £377.00k £670.00k £1.22m £875.00k £640.00k
Income - Other £2.73m £1.29m £1.06m £1.28m £867.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £43.44m £55.02m £49.77m £52.96m £46.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £929.00k £1.11m £1.04m £1.09m £1.06m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £72.00k £124.00k £122.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £51.00k £69.00k £58.00k £58.00k £66.00k
Expenditure - Other -£15.85m £4.89m £3.98m £3.88m £3.33m