Trustees WILTSHIRE RURAL MUSIC SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 309496
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peggy Elizabeth Snell | Chair | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Coatman | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Teal | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Victoria Davies | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Kathryn Watchman | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Gladys Parker | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Prof Amanda Jane Alison Bayley | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vernon Frederick Hitchman | Trustee | 05 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Leslie Thorn | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|||||
DOUGLAS ANTHONY BENSON | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR CARBIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHILIP SPRINGATE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.