Financial history WOODSTOCK EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £8.93k £6.99k £7.34k £11.57k £9.62k
Total expenditure £9.06k £8.78k £7.01k £8.51k £8.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A