Accounts and annual returns HEADINGTON SCHOOL OXFORD LIMITED GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 309679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 26 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 17 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 13 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 27 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 18 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 21 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window