Trustees ST EDWARD'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 309681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mr Chris Jones Chair
DRAGON SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Professor Richard Anthony Cooper Trustee 25 January 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SS PHILIP AND JAMES WITH ST MARGARET
Received: 88 days late
THE ST BENET'S TRUST
Received: 67 days late
Alan Kerr Buchanan Trustee 25 January 2024
CITIZENS ADVICE OXFORDSHIRE
Received: On time
The Venerable Jonathan Paul Michael Chaffey Trustee 01 September 2022
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST IN OXFORD OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING HENRY VIII
Received: On time
OXFORD CLERGY CHARITY
Received: On time
BAYNE BENEFACTION
Received: On time
NEW HINKSEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL AND SCHOOL HOUSE OXFORDSHIRE
Received: On time
Helen Rachel Phillips nee Cook Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
JOHN ADEDAMOLA OLUMIDE ADEDOYIN Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record
Philip Winston Trustee 27 November 2020
None on record
Joe Burrows Trustee 26 June 2020
None on record
Sarah Ainsworth Trustee 26 June 2020
None on record
Dr Clare Robertson Trustee 16 March 2018
OXFORDSHIRE DEAF CHILDREN'S SOCIETY
Received: On time
EDWARD WILFRID STEPHENSON MA MCT Trustee 24 June 2016
None on record
MRS Carloine Mary Baggs Trustee 21 November 2014
None on record
Georgina Arabella Sarah Dennis Trustee 21 November 2014
THE NORTH WALL TRUST
Received: On time
MICHAEL ROULSTON Trustee 25 May 2011
None on record
Dr LOUISE L'ESTRANGE FAWCETT POSADA Trustee
None on record
KENNETH MACRITCHIE Trustee
None on record