Trustees KETTERING OLD GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 309903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Alderman | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Moodie | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Reynolds | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Stuart Welch | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WALTERS | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAT SCOUSE | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|||||
MARGARET ISLA MITCHELL | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY SHEMILT | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR GHITE BHAVRA | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES WATSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
BILL PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.