Financial history ELEANOR HAMILTON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 309997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £265.86k £263.78k £276.82k £269.71k £216.51k
Total expenditure £284.08k £346.29k £340.44k £386.50k £378.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A