Dogfen lywodraethu THE KINGHAM HILL TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEEDS DATED 16/12/1912 10/5/1932 12/11/1941 13/11/1941 26/7/1948 AND 15/10/1952 AND ORDERS OF THE HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE 13/11/1931 22/5/1944 SCHEME 9/3/1984 AND 23/10/1990 AND SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 30TH JULY 1999
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RECEIVE MAINTAIN EDUCATE AND GENERALLY ASSIST POOR BOYS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING FOR THEM A TRAINING PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL AND BY HELPING THEM TO START IN LIFE. TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A COLLEGE FOR TRAINING MEN AND WOMEN (OF ANY AGE) FOR ORDINATION OR OTHER MINISTRY IN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR OTHER PROTESTANT DENOMINATIONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE POWERS CLAUSE).
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.