BRANDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION HALL

Charity number: 1075364
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 January 2020 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time Download