WHITBY DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1081121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £20.67k £23.71k £32.26k £26.87k £23.73k
Total expenditure £24.31k £29.33k £36.37k £28.00k £31.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A