OLD SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 310348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.21k £3.56k £3.69k £3.78k £3.45k
Total expenditure £4.00k £2.50k £1.20k £3.25k £3.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A