TOWN ESTATE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.40k £5.00k £5.34k £5.51k £5.30k
Total expenditure £5.49k £5.18k £5.03k £5.19k £5.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A