TOWN ESTATE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin David Harrison Trustee 01 January 2021
PAKENHAM TOWN ESTATE Received: On time
Cedric Palfrey Trustee 07 May 2015
PAKENHAM TOWN ESTATE Received: On time
Rev KATHERINE VALENTINE Chair 08 July 2011
PAKENHAM CHARITIES Received: On time
PAKENHAM TOWN ESTATE Received: On time
Anne Harrison Trustee 05 December 2016
PAKENHAM TOWN ESTATE Received: On time
DEREK DORLING Trustee 01 May 1995
PAKENHAM CHARITIES Received: On time
PAKENHAM TOWN ESTATE Received: On time