ST PATRICKS SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1067318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.75k £1.70k £1.70k £3.02k £3.21k
Total expenditure £46 £18 £0 £1.84k £1.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A