BENDALL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £5.06k £6.41k £6.54k £6.70k £6.90k
Total expenditure £7.50k £5.00k £6.00k £8.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A