CHRISTIAN HOPE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1061526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £162.67k £178.80k £185.41k £174.84k £217.95k
Total expenditure £146.97k £174.63k £169.47k £189.31k £185.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A