Financial history THE JEAN MARY GOWANS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1063325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £5.47k £5.39k £5.85k £6.60k £3.60k
Total expenditure £4.01k £8.31k £5.55k £6.11k £4.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A