CATS IN NEED CYPRUS

Charity number: 1061206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 16 June 2020 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 04 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 02 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required