CATS IN NEED CYPRUS

Charity number: 1061206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £6.67k £6.74k £5.04k £2.83k £6.67k
Total expenditure £1.46k £890 £1.64k £251 £2.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A